IL HB4899 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Code.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Brauer [R] | Rep. Raymond Poe [R] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] |
Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1154 |
2015-01-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-12-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-04 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 3, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000 |
2014-11-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-11-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading November 20, 2014 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-11-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-11-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-11-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-11-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2014-11-19 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-11-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-11-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-11-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2014-11-18 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rich Brauer |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rich Brauer |
2014-11-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-18 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |