IL HB4602 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the One Day Rest In Seven Act. Provides that the calculation of required rest days does not include any time that the employee is on call. Provides that an employee who voluntarily agrees to work on a day of rest must be paid at his or her regular hourly rate or, if applicable, at the overtime wage rate as required by the Illinois Minimum Wage Law. Provides that every employer shall permit its employees who are scheduled or expected to work (rather than are to work) for 7 1/2 continuous hours at least 20 minutes for a meal period beginning no later than 5 hours after the start of the work period. Provides that any employer, or agent or officer of an employer, has violated the Act if he or she discharges, takes an adverse action against, or in any other manner discriminates against any employee because that employee has exercised a right under the Act. Provides that the Director of Labor may (rather than shall) grant long term and short permits authorizing the employment of persons on days of rest. Makes changes in provisions concerning definitions; posting requirements; recordkeeping; and civil offenses. Makes other changes.
Title
ONE DAY OF REST-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-010-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 140 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 140 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 140 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 140 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 140 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 140 | 5.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 140 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4602&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4602.htm |