IL HB4501 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0671
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0671
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consent by Minors to Medical Procedures Act. Provides that a minor may be deemed an "unaccompanied minor" if the minor (1) is living separate and apart from his or her parents or legal guardian, whether with or without the consent of a parent or legal guardian and regardless of the duration of the separate residence, and (2) is managing his or her own personal affairs. Provides that the consent of an unaccompanied minor to a medical or surgical procedure by a health care provider is considered valid if (i) the health care provider rendering the medical or surgical procedure under the Act relied in good faith upon the representations of the minor that the minor is an unaccompanied minor or (ii) the minor is identified, verbally or in writing, as an unaccompanied minor by certain entities. Sets forth provisions concerning liabilities, minors' powers, and third parties.
Title
CONSENT BY MINOR-UNACCOMPANIED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0671 |
2014-06-27 | House | Effective Date October 1, 2014 |
2014-06-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 2, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2014-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2014-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 210 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 210 | 1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |