IL HB4365 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 212
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows the Secretary of State to issue special registration plates designated as Defense Superior Service plates or Defense Distinguished Service plates to residents of the State.
Title
VEH CD-DEFENSE SERVICE PLATES
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Kevin Schmidt [R] |
Rep. Sharon Chung [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2024-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-02-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-699.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.24 | New Code | See Bill Text |