IL HB4299 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Provides that the knowing possession of not more than 10 grams of any substance containing cannabis is a petty offense with a fine not exceeding $100 (rather than a Class C or B misdemeanor). Provides that the knowing possession of more than 10 grams but not more than 30 grams of any substance containing cannabis is a petty offense with a fine not exceeding $100 for a first offense (rather than a Class A misdemeanor) and a Class A misdemeanor for a subsequent offense (rather than a Class 4 felony). Provides that the knowing possession of more than 30 grams but not more than 500 grams of any substance containing cannabis is a Class A misdemeanor (rather than a Class 4 felony). Provides that the knowing manufacture, delivery, or possession with intent to deliver, or manufacture of not more than 10 grams of any substance containing cannabis is a petty offense with a fine not to exceed $100 (rather than a Class B or A misdemeanor). Provides that the knowing manufacture, delivery, or possession with intent to deliver, or manufacture of more than 10 grams but nor more than 30 grams of any substance containing cannabis is a Class A misdemeanor (rather than a Class 4 felony). Provides that the production or possession of not more than 5 cannabis sativa plants is a petty offense with a fine not exceeding $100 (rather than a Class A misdemeanor). Provides that the production or possession of more than 5 but not more than 20 cannabis sativa plants is a Class A misdemeanor (rather than a Class 4 felony).
Title
CANNABIS-PENALTIES
Sponsors
Rep. Christian Mitchell [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Derrick Smith [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] |
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-05 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-05 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-03-25 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 006-000-000 |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2014-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 550 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 550 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 550 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4299&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4299.htm |