IL HB4261 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on Aging. Provides that all records containing resident, participant, and complainant information collected by the Long Term Care Ombudsman Program are confidential and shall not be disclosed outside of the program without a lawful subpoena or the permission of the State Ombudsman. Permits the State Ombudsman, at his or her discretion, to disclose resident or participant information if it is in the best interest of the resident or participant. Requires the Department on Aging to establish procedures for the disclosure of program records by the State Ombudsman. Provides that the procedures shall prohibit disclosure of a resident's identity in case records unless the resident gives consent.
Title
AGING-OMBUDSMAN PROGRAM
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Olickal [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] | Rep. Yolanda Morris [D] |
Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-12-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |