IL HB4237 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Permits the taking of wild turkey by a shotgun of not larger than 10 gauge nor smaller than .410 bore. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources may, by administrative rule, restrict shot size, material, or density. Now, the Code permits the taking of wild turkey by a shotgun of not larger than 10 nor smaller than 20 gauge with shot size not larger than No. 4.
Title
WILDLIFE CD-WLD TURKEY-SHOTGUN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-11-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |