IL HB4224 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Local Library Act. Provides that the bond of a library treasurer or custodian of the moneys paid over to a library board shall not be less than 10% (rather than 50%) of the total funds received by the library in the last fiscal year or the treasurer or custodian of the moneys paid over to a library board may provide insurance coverage for negligent and intentional acts by library officials and employees that could result in the loss of library funds in an amount at least equal to 10% (rather than 50%) of the average amount of the library's operating fund from the prior 3 fiscal years. Makes similar changes in the Illinois Library System Act and the Public Library District Act of 1991 relating to treasurer bonds. Effective immediately.
Title
LIBRARY-BOND PERCENTAGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-017-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2024-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2024-04-04 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-12-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2023-11-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-11-08 | House | First Reading |
2023-11-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
75 | 16 | 30-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
75 | 5 | 4-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |