IL HB3793 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-08 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 034-073-005
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-08 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 034-073-005
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if the total equalized assessed value of all taxable property in the taxing district for the current levy year (excluding new property, recovered tax increment value, and property that is annexed to or disconnected from the taxing district in the current levy year) is less than the total equalized assessed value of all taxable property in the taxing district for the previous levy year, then the extension limitation is (a) 0% or (b) the rate of increase approved by voters (instead of the lesser of 5% or the percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index during the 12-month calendar year preceding the levy year or (b) the rate of increase approved by voters). Effective immediately.
Title
PTELL-EXTENSION LIMITATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 34 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 034-073-005 |
2011-11-08 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-11-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2011-11-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2011-11-04 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2011-11-04 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2011-11-04 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2011-11-03 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2011-11-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-11-01 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-11-01 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2011-10-28 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2011-10-28 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2011-10-27 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-10-27 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-10-27 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-10-27 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-10-27 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-10-27 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-10-27 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-10-27 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2011-10-27 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2011-10-27 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2011-10-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-26 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-10-26 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-10-26 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2011-10-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2011-10-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-001-001 |
2011-10-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-10-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-10-19 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2011 |
2011-10-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-10-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-05 | House | First Reading |
2011-09-19 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2011-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2011-07-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-07-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-07-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-07-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-07-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2011-07-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-07-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-07-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-07-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kent Gaffney |
2011-07-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2011-07-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Cunningham |
2011-06-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |