IL HB3690 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Removes language that provides that the Block Grants Article does not apply to the Chicago school district. Repeals the Block Grants for Chicago Article. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-BLOCK GRANTS-CHICAGO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | First Reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2013-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2013-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2013-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2013-10-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2013-10-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-7.02b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 14-7.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1C-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | Art. 1D | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3690&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3690.htm |