IL HB2793 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Provides for the election (instead of appointment) of members of the Chicago Board of Education. Provides that successor Inspectors General shall be appointed by the Board instead of the Mayor.
Title
SCH CD-CHICAGO BD OF ED-ELECT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-10-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 34-13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2793&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2793.htm |