IL HB1672 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Military Affairs to convey described real estate in Franklin County, Illinois.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-03-07 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |