ID S1429 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Signed by Governor on 03/28/14 Session Law Chapter 316 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Signed by Governor on 03/28/14 Session Law Chapter 316 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to salaries of members of the Public Utilities Commission, members of the State Tax Commission and members of the Industrial Commission; to provide for an increase in salary for members of the Public Utilities Commission; to provide for an increase in salary for members of the State Tax Commission; to provide for an increase in salary for members of the Industrial Commission; appropriates an additional $6,800 to the Public Utilities Commission for commissioner salaries; appropriates an additional $8,500 to the State Tax Commission for commissioner salaries; appropriates an additional $6,700 to the Industrial Commission for commissioner salaries; and provides for a one-time increase for commissioner salaries.
Title
Amends existing law relating to salaries of members of the Public Utilities Commission, members of the State Tax Commission and members of the Industrial Commission; to provide for an increase in salary for members of the Public Utilities Commission; to provide for an increase in salary for members of the State Tax Commission; to provide for an increase in salary for members of the Industrial Commission; appropriates an additional $6,800 to the Public Utilities Commission for commissioner salaries; appropriates an additional $8,500 to the State Tax Commission for commissioner salaries; appropriates an additional $6,700 to the Industrial Commission for commissioner salaries; and provides for a one-time increase for commissioner salaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/28/14 Session Law Chapter 316 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/24/14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | House | Miller |
2014-03-20 | House | 61-8-1 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Barrett, Boyle, Harris, McMillan, Nielsen, Palmer, Sims Absent -- Rubel Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 68 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 2, read three times |
2014-03-20 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Bayer |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 34-0-1 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Bock, Brackett, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Buckner-Webb Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-19 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |