ID S1380 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 188 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 188 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SOCIAL SERVICES -- Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding the Office of Health and Social Services ombudsman.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding the Office of Health and Social Services ombudsman.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 188 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2024-03-19 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2024-03-18 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-18 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-18 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 50-20-0 |
2024-03-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2024-03-07 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 30-4-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |