ID S1296 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Ret’d to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Ret’d to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
DISTRIBUTED LEDGER TECHNOLOGY -- Adds to existing law to establish the Distributed Ledger Technology Act to provide for certain rights regarding the use of distributed ledger technology.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish the Distributed Ledger Technology Act to provide for certain rights regarding the use of distributed ledger technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Ret’d to House |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- FAILED 17-18-0 |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |