ID HCR015 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:12 a.m. on March 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:12 a.m. on March 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IDAHO WHEAT COMMISSION -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Idaho Wheat Commission relating to Rules of the Idaho Wheat Commission.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Idaho Wheat Commission relating to Rules of the Idaho Wheat Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:12 a.m. on March 10, 2017 |
2017-03-10 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-08 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-06 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-24 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-24 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-02-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/HCR015/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/HCR015.pdf |