ID H0492 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2014 Session Law Chapter 338 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2014 Session Law Chapter 338 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to replace the term "registered" with the term "numbered"; to remove language relating to certain registration fees; to provide that each snowmobile must be numbered; to provide for application of law and to provide for a prohibition; to revise a fine; to revise provisions relating to the sale of certain vehicles; and to provide for rules.
Title
Amends existing law to replace the term "registered" with the term "numbered"; to remove language relating to certain registration fees; to provide that each snowmobile must be numbered; to provide for application of law and to provide for a prohibition; to revise a fine; to revise provisions relating to the sale of certain vehicles; and to provide for rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2014 Session Law Chapter 338 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | to enrol |
2014-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | House | Gestrin |
2014-03-20 | House | 59-10-1 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Meline, Miller, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Harris, Luker, Mendive, Monks, Nielsen, Perry, Vander Woude Absent -- Rubel Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 68 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 2, read three times |
2014-03-20 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2014-03-19 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2014-03-19 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2014-03-18 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2014-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-18 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-02-26 | House | to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Title apvd |
2014-02-26 | House | PASSED -- 51-12-7 |
2014-02-26 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-02-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |