ID H0463 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - March 23, 2016 Session Law Chapter 145 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - March 23, 2016 Session Law Chapter 145 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MINIMUM WAGE - Amends existing law to revise obsolete language and to prohibit political subdivisions from establishing minimum wages higher than the minimum wages provided by state law.
Title
Amends existing law to revise obsolete language and to prohibit political subdivisions from establishing minimum wages higher than the minimum wages provided by state law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | March 23, 2016 Session Law Chapter 145 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-17 | House | Law without signature |
2016-03-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on March 16, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-14 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-10 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-10 | Senate | PASSED -- 27-8-0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-02-19 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-19 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-19 | House | PASSED -- 55-14-1 |
2016-02-19 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |