IA SF85 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progress, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act establishing the Iowa online advanced placement academy science, technology, engineering, and mathematics initiative and making an appropriation. (See SF 437.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act establishing the Iowa online advanced placement academy science, technology, engineering, and mathematics initiative and making an appropriation. (See SF 437.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-12-31 END OF 2011 ACTIONS
2011-01-31 Subcommittee reassigned, Quirmbach, Boettger, and Schoenjahn. S.J. 186.
2011-01-27 Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Boettger, and Sodders. S.J. 179.
2011-01-24 Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 130.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback