IA SF434 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to an electric or natural gas vehicle facility tax credit and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 238.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to an electric or natural gas vehicle facility tax credit and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 238.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-23 | House | Subcommittee, Landon, Byrnes, and Kelley. H.J. 923. |
2013-04-09 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 811. |
2013-04-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 811. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 785. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 780. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 733. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 717. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 714. |