IA SF2352 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-26 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-26 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the additional homestead credit for certain disabled veterans and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3219.) Effective 5-26-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the additional homestead credit for certain disabled veterans and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3219.) Effective 5-26-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 930. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 929. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 929. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 875. |
2014-04-28 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 827. |
2014-04-28 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 826. |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 767. |
2014-04-17 | House | Subcommittee, Windschitl, Kearns, and Landon. H.J. 766. |
2014-04-15 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 733. |
2014-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 733. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 774. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 774. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 762. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 762. |