IA SF2351 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-15 - Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 724.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-15 - Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 724.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the state preschool program for four-year-old children by establishing a preschool expansion incentive, authorizing state aid for the incentive, and addressing program costs. (Formerly SSB 3155 and SF 2268.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the state preschool program for four-year-old children by establishing a preschool expansion incentive, authorizing state aid for the incentive, and addressing program costs. (Formerly SSB 3155 and SF 2268.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 724. |
2014-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 723. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 768. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 22. S.J. 768. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Amendment S-5150 filed, adopted. S.J. 767. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Amendment S-5149 lost. S.J. 767. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5149, ruled in order. S.J. 767. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Amendment S-5149 filed. S.J. 767. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 753. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 753. |