IA SF2311 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 851.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 851.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the criminal offenses of enticing a minor, prostitution, sexual exploitation of a minor, and human trafficking, providing for a fee, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the criminal offenses of enticing a minor, prostitution, sexual exploitation of a minor, and human trafficking, providing for a fee, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 851. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 826. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 826. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 744. |
2014-04-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 689. |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 688. |
2014-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8209. H.J. 688. |
2014-04-02 | House | Senate amendment H-8209 filed. H.J. 662. |
2014-04-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 658. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 709. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 708. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5086, as amended. S.J. 708. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5121 to S-5086 adopted. S.J. 708. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5124, ruled out of order. S.J. 708. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5124 to S-5121 filed. S.J. 707. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5123 to S-5121 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 707. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5121 to S-5086 filed. S.J. 707. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5086. S.J. 618. |
2014-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 548. |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 545. |
2014-03-19 | House | Committee amendment H-8117 adopted. H.J. 544. |
2014-03-19 | House | Amendments H-8124 and H-8125 withdrawn. H.J. 544. |
2014-03-19 | House | Amendment H-8135 to committee amendment H-8117 lost. H.J. 544. |
2014-03-19 | House | Amendment H-8135 to committee amendment H-8117 filed. H.J. 543. |
2014-03-18 | House | Amendments H-8124 and H-8125 to H-8117 filed. H.J. 535. |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee amendment H-8117 filed. H.J. 497. |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 495. |
2014-03-04 | House | Subcommittee, Heartsill, Baltimore, and Prichard. H.J. 417. |
2014-02-28 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 374. |
2014-02-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 365. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 426. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 424. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 356. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 346. |