IA HF684 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing limited immunity from certain criminal offenses and prohibiting certain disciplinary sanctions for persons under twenty-one years of age who report, seek, or require emergency assistance for alcohol overdoses, and modifying penalties. (Formerly HSB 175.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act providing limited immunity from certain criminal offenses and prohibiting certain disciplinary sanctions for persons under twenty-one years of age who report, seek, or require emergency assistance for alcohol overdoses, and modifying penalties. (Formerly HSB 175.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 789. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 789. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 792. |
2020-06-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 722. |
2020-06-12 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 1. H.J. 717. |
2020-06-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8262. H.J. 716. |
2020-06-11 | House | Senate amendment H-8262 filed. H.J. 711. |
2020-06-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 692. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 756. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 2. S.J. 755. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5114 adopted. S.J. 755. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Amendment S-5114 filed. S.J. 717. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 717. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2020 12:30PM RM 315. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Sinclair. S.J. 530. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 499. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 499. |
2020-03-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 439. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 532. |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 3. H.J. 437. |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on calendar H.J. 311. |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 311. |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2020 8:30AM RM 308. |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee: Klein, Breckenridge and Jeneary. H.J. 198. |
2019-04-27 | House | Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 1076. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 757. |
2019-03-14 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 479. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1107 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB175 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 421.
SF310 (Similar To) 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee: Nunn, R. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 362.
SF342 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Nunn, and R. Taylor. S.J. 86.
HSB175 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 421.
SF310 (Similar To) 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee: Nunn, R. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 362.
SF342 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Nunn, and R. Taylor. S.J. 86.