IA HF368 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 725.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 725.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to specified utility construction project requirements, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 565.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to specified utility construction project requirements, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 565.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 725. |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 565. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470. |
2023-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2023-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2023 10:45AM RM 19. |
2023-02-20 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Kaufmann and Wilburn. H.J. 382. |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 372. |
Same As/Similar To
HF565 (Similar To) 2023-03-28 - Subcommittee: Bousselot, Bisignano, and Dawson. S.J. 707.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF368 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF368.html |