IA HF2644 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to transportation and other infrastructure- related appropriations to the department of transportation, including allocation and use of moneys from the road use tax fund and the primary road fund and other related provisions, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 711.) Effective date: 06/30/2020. Applicability date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to transportation and other infrastructure- related appropriations to the department of transportation, including allocation and use of moneys from the road use tax fund and the primary road fund and other related provisions, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 711.) Effective date: 06/30/2020. Applicability date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-13 | House | NOBA: Final |
2020-06-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 746. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 807. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 806. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2415. S.J. 806. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 2415. S.J. 804. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 804. |
2020-06-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 743. |
2020-06-12 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 732. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8291 adopted. H.J. 731. |
2020-06-11 | House | Amendment H-8291 filed. H.J. 725. |
2020-06-10 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2020-06-10 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 672. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB711 (Related) 2020-06-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 690.
SSB3203 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2415.
SF2415 (Similar To) 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 807.
SSB3203 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2415.
SF2415 (Similar To) 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 807.