IA HF2640 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - NOBA: House Full Approps
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - NOBA: House Full Approps
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act making an appropriation to support efforts relating to commissioning the U.S.S. Iowa SSN 797, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 2525, HSB 657.)
Title
A bill for an act making an appropriation to support efforts relating to commissioning the U.S.S. Iowa SSN 797, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 2525, HSB 657.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 533. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2077 (Similar To) 2024-01-30 - Subcommittee: Reichman, Lofgren, and Wahls. S.J. 169.
HSB657 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2525.
HF2525 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2640.
HSB657 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2525.
HF2525 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2640.