IA HF2496 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1563.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1563.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to recycling initiatives. Effective 7-01-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to recycling initiatives. Effective 7-01-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1563. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1559. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1559. | |
2010-03-26 | Message from House. S.J. 1021. | |
2010-03-26 | Immediate message. H.J. 1353. | |
2010-03-26 | Passed House, ayes 92, nays 3. H.J. 1350. | |
2010-03-26 | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8561. H.J. 1350. | |
2010-03-23 | Senate amendment H-8561 filed. H.J. 1185. | |
2010-03-23 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1176. | |
2010-03-23 | Immediate message. S.J. 947. | |
2010-03-23 | Passed Senate, ayes 37, nays 12. S.J. 944. | |
2010-03-23 | Amendment S-5184 adopted as amended. S.J. 944. | |
2010-03-23 | Amendment S-5308 filed, adopted. S.J. 944. | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 806. | |
2010-03-03 | Amendment S-5184 filed. S.J. 676. | |
2010-03-03 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 651. | |
2010-02-25 | Subcommittee, Bolkcom, Stewart, and Ward. S.J. 605. | |
2010-02-25 | Read first time, referred to Environment & Energy Independence. S.J. 582. | |
2010-02-25 | Message from House. S.J. 582. | |
2010-02-24 | Immediate message. H.J. 709. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed House, ayes 89, nays 6. H.J. 708. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 615. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=1441C&ga=83 |