IA HF2445 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 850.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 850.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of certain economic development programs by the economic development authority and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2352) (Formerly HSB 591)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of certain economic development programs by the economic development authority and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2352) (Formerly HSB 591)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 850. |
2014-04-30 | House | Substituted SF 2359. H.J. 848. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendments H-8290, H-8237, H-8247, and H-8207 withdrawn. H.J. 848. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8302 adopted. H.J. 848. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8295 withdrawn. H.J. 848. |
2014-04-23 | House | Amendments H-8295 and H-8302 filed. H.J. 792. |
2014-04-22 | House | Amendment H-8290 filed. H.J. 776. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8247 filed. H.J. 716. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8237 filed. H.J. 713. |
2014-04-02 | House | Amendment H-8207 filed. H.J. 662. |
2014-03-17 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 498. |
2014-03-12 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 485. |