IA HF2387 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to electric fuel, including the electric fuel excise tax and biennial electric fuel dispenser inspections.
Title
A bill for an act relating to electric fuel, including the electric fuel excise tax and biennial electric fuel dispenser inspections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-03-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2024 8:00AM RM 19. |
2024-03-06 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Kaufmann, Harris and Judge. H.J. 536. |
2024-03-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/13/2024 12:45PM RM 19 (Cancelled). |
2024-02-21 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Harris and Isenhart. H.J. 361. |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 224. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2387 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2387.html |