IA HF2221 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the licensed health professional member of a local board of health. (Formerly HF 2031.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the licensed health professional member of a local board of health. (Formerly HF 2031.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 789. |
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 789. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 713. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 787. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 787. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 532. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2020 3:30PM RM 315. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Quirmbach, and Segebart. S.J. 469. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 408. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 408. |
2020-02-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 348. |
2020-03-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 443. |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 342. |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 180. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2031 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 348.