IA HF204 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles that traverse certain railroad grade crossings against a gate or signal, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 84.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles that traverse certain railroad grade crossings against a gate or signal, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 84.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 926. |
2024-04-19 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925. |
2024-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 609. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 560. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 557. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 243. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 12:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Celsi, and Webster. S.J. 79. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. S.J. 1091. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Attached to SF 360. S.J. 400. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 347. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 347. |
2023-02-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 351. |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed House, yeas 99 nays 0. H.J. 319. |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 247. |
Same As/Similar To
SF96 (Similar To) 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 360. S.J. 398.
HSB84 (Related) 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 204.
SF360 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Transportation. S.J. 1091.
HSB84 (Related) 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 204.
SF360 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Transportation. S.J. 1091.