HI SCR139 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Task Force Be Convened To Examine Successful Public Mass Transit Projects In Appropriate Cities And Countries And Develop Options To Reduce Cost And Return Increased Value To Residents From Funds Made Available By The State For Public Mass Transit.
Title
Requesting A Task Force Be Convened To Examine Successful Public Mass Transit Projects In Appropriate Cities And Countries And Develop Options To Reduce Cost And Return Increased Value To Residents From Funds Made Available By The State For Public Mass Transit.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1869-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-04-11 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 424). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3506) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-28-24 3:05PM; CR 224. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR120 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.