HI SB3002 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Transportation to implement the recommendations of Task Force on Mobility Management, established pursuant to Act 214, SLH 2013, in consultation with the Aging and Disability Resource Center of the Executive Office on Aging and other stakeholder groups. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Making An Appropriation To Implement The Recommendations Of The Task Force On Mobility Management, Established Pursuant To Act 214, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; San Buenaventura. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Marten, Todd, Takenouchi Co-Chairs; Amato, Matsumoto. |
2024-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2024-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aiu, Kila, Lamosao voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1842-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Kila, Lamosao; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2024-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-03-22 | House | Reported from HUS/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1318-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2024-03-14 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HUS/TRN on Tuesday, 03-19-24 10:50AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/TRN on Tuesday, 03-19-24 10:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to HUS/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 240) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3038) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2602) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TCA/HHS, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |