HI SB2478 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH/TRS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH/TRS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a definition of "substance abuse" and amends the definitions of "drug" and "substance" for purposes of operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant violations.
Title
Relating To Intoxicants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/TRS, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1765 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - Re-referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 18
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2478&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2478_.HTM |