HI SB2478 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tax credits for the investment, transportation expenditures, and certain payroll costs associated with a qualified live musical or theatrical production or qualified musical or theatrical facility infrastructure project. Applies to tax years beginning after 12/31/30. (SD1)
Title
Musical or Theatrical Production; Facility Infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2154) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-08-10 1:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-05-10 1:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-10 1:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |