HI SB2285 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 5:30PM in Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 5:30PM in Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the functions and duties of the State Health Planning and Development Agency. Clarifies the definition of "health care". Establishes a task force known as the Hui Hoomana. Establishes positions. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD3)
Title
Relating To The State Health Planning And Development Agency.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 5:30PM in Conference Room 329. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 4:40 PM; CR 329. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 3:10PM; Conference Room 329. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-24 3:15PM; Conference Room 329. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 803). |
2024-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takenouchi, Marten, Nakashima, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Amato, Alcos. |
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Awa. |
2024-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 698). |
2024-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1825-24) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2024-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 4:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1334-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Gates, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Tam. |
2024-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5). |
2024-03-15 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1143-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-03-14 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-14 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-14-24 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-24 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2024-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-13-24 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-24 at 11:30 AM in conference room 329. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Tuesday, 03-12-24 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 94) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2800) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2186) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation
Department of Health
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Function and Duties
Hui Hoomana
Positions
Reports
SHPDA
Department of Health
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Function and Duties
Hui Hoomana
Positions
Reports
SHPDA