HI SB2197 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Fale, Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a renewable fuels production income tax credit. Repeals the ethanol facility tax credit. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2197 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Credit; Renewable Fuels

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Fale, Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
2014-03-21HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1144-14), recommending referral to FIN.
2014-03-18HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Ito, Choy, Onishi, Tokioka, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana, Cachola; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
2014-03-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-18-14 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2014-03-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with Representative(s) Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4).
2014-03-14HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 971-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB.
2014-03-13HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Say, Fale; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2014-03-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-13-14 11:30AM in conference room 325.
2014-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-14.
2014-03-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-11-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2014-03-06HouseReferred to EEP, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 28
2014-03-06HousePass First Reading
2014-03-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 114) in amended form (SD 2).
2014-03-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
2014-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
2014-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2785) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2014-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2014-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-25-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2014-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:15AM in conference room 211.
2014-02-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2014-02-07SenateReported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2117) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2014-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom.
2014-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 3:15PM in conference room 225.
2014-01-17SenateReferred to ENE, WAM.
2014-01-16SenatePassed First Reading.
2014-01-16SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2060 (Same As) 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:35PM in conference room 225.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback