HI SB2015 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the priority for which moneys in the Rental Housing Revolving Fund are to be used.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1764 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Government-Owned Housing
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Housing
Limited Profit Housing Associations
RHRF
Supportive Housing
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Housing
Limited Profit Housing Associations
RHRF
Supportive Housing
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2015&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2015_.HTM |