HI HR60 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Department Of Defense, Including The Navy, Army, And Air Force, To Increase On-base Housing Availability For Active Duty Personnel And Their Dependents Assigned To Military Installations In The State.
Title
Requesting The United States Department Of Defense, Including The Navy, Army, And Air Force, To Increase On-base Housing Availability For Active Duty Personnel And Their Dependents Assigned To Military Installations In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-03-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Woodson excused (3). |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1385-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Ichiyama, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:00AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to CMV, referral sheet 18 |
2024-03-07 | House | Offered |
2024-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR75 (Same As) 2024-04-18 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=60&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HR60_.HTM |