HI HB836 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB836
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the interisland transportation of marijuana by medicinal marijuana patients and primary caregivers. Requires Departments of Health and Transportation to adopt rules according to chapter 91 regarding interisland transportation of marijuana. (HB836 HD1)
Title
Relating To Marijuana.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Tokioka, Tupola voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 162) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-07-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB836 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Tokioka, Tupola voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).