HI HB2478 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progress
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a taxpayer who hires an individual with a disability a nonrefundable tax credit for the six-month period after the individual is initially hired by the taxpayer. Repeals existing tax credit for taxpayers who hire vocational rehabilitation referrals. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2050. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual with a Disability; Employment; Income Tax Credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2014-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 4:00PM in conference room 229.
2014-04-16HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 4:15PM in conference room 229.
2014-04-15HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 4:00PM in conference room 229.
2014-04-14HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673).
2014-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
2014-04-14HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Carroll, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Kawakami, Fukumoto Members.
2014-04-14SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Slom Member.
2014-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
2014-04-10HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2014-04-08HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 650) in amended form (SD 2).
2014-04-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
2014-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
2014-04-04SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3343) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2014-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland.
2014-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:15AM in conference room 211.
2014-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2014-03-20SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2974) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2014-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom.
2014-03-07SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 1:30PM in conference room 016.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2014-03-04SenatePassed First Reading.
2014-03-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 190).
2014-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2014-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 704-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2014-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2014-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2014-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3).
2014-02-14HouseReported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 455-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2014-02-11HouseThe committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Belatti, Woodson.
2014-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-11-14 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2014-01-27HouseReferred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 7
2014-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2014-01-22HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback