HI HB2225 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes provisions governing any person who receives compensation for advising or assisting another person with veterans benefits. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Veterans Rights And Benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 370-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ichiyama, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden. |
2024-02-02 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-07-24 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to CMV, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2095 (Same As) 2024-01-22 - The committee(s) on HHS/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-24-24 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.