HI HB1959 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Aerospace and Aeronautics Development Program within the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism. Takes effect 1/1/2060. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Andrew Garrett [D] | Rep. Trish La Chica [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Tyson Miyake [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3141) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 31). |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Belatti, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 691-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-22 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Poepoe; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Nishimoto. |
2024-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2). |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 293-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) La Chica. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-07-24 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2081 (Same As) 2024-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).