HI HB1763 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation from forgiving any loan made from the Rental Housing Revolving Fund unless the Corporation forecloses on the project. Amends the permitted uses of and priority for which moneys in the Rental Housing Revolving Fund are to be used. Repeals the authorization to use Rental Housing Revolving Fund to provide grants. Requires the Corporation to submit a report to the Legislature on plans to revolve funds back into the Rental Housing Revolving Fund. Applies to Rental Housing Revolving Fund applications submitted after 6/30/2024. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Evslin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 167-24). |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 167-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Garrett, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 4:00 PM; CR 016. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 11:00AM; CR 224. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 11:00AM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 11:00AM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-24 11:00AM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-24 11:00AM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Hashimoto Co-Chair; Kanuha. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evslin, Aiu Co-Chairs; Garrett, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 514) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3717) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Kidani. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-24 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3166) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 215). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 12:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 364-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-09 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila. |
2024-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-09-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2045 (Same As) 2024-02-13 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.