HI HB1671 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits intentionally leaving or confining pet animals in a vehicle under conditions that endanger their health, safety, or well-being. Permits law enforcement officers, animal control officers, and firefighters to enter an unattended vehicle to protect the health, safety, or well-being of a pet animal that is endangered by being left or confined in an unattended vehicle. Allows private citizens to rescue a pet animal that has been left in an unattended vehicle under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating To Animal Endangerment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2561 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1671&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1671_.HTM |