HI HB154 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of land and natural resources to review all proposed projects to determine effects on historic properties, aviation artifacts, or burial sites.
Title
Historic Preservation
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Hermina Morita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1072 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=154 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB154_.HTM |