HI HB1513 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1513
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits civil and criminal liability for persons who remove unattended animals from motor vehicles that are in physical danger if the actions are reasonable, in good faith, and in accordance with other requirements. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Unattended Animals In Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 606) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-15 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-15-23 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1513 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).