HI HB1424 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1424
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the identity statement used for labeling or advertising hemp products identify the percentage of Hawaii grown hemp and hemp of other origins contained in hemp products. Appropriates funds. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Hemp.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Elle Cochran [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Kirstin Kahaloa [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Rose Martinez [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 545) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-02-13 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-13-23 2:20PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1424 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
SB516 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
SB516 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).