GA SB577 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of DeKalb County, formerly known as the Civil and Criminal Court of DeKalb County, approved February 14, 1951 (Ga. L. 1951, p. 2401), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 11, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5059), so as to provide for landlords to remove personal property following execution of writs of possession within seven days of such execution; to authorize the marshal to remove such property after 14 days; to authorize the marshal to appoint ex-officio assistants to the marshal; to provide for the collection of costs associated with such removal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Court of DeKalb County; landlords to remove personal property following execution of writs of possession within seven days; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Jackson [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Sally Harrell [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] |
Sen. Gail Davenport [D] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #763 (Y: 171 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #672 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #672 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |